Senate | 07/06/2021 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 06/24/2021 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/24/2021 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 06/23/2021 | Public Act 21-123 | ||
Senate | 06/07/2021 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/07/2021 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 04/15/2021 | House Calendar Number 357 | ||
Senate | 04/15/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/14/2021 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2021 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 03/24/2021 | File Number 129 | ||
Senate | 03/24/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 129 | ||
Senate | 03/24/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/24/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/18/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/21 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/19/2021 | Public Hearing 02/23 | ||
Senate | 02/18/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |