Senate | 05/21/2021 | House Calendar Number 530 | ||
Senate | 05/21/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/19/2021 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 05/19/2021 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8292 | ||
Senate | 04/19/2021 | File Number 514 | ||
Senate | 04/19/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 309 | ||
Senate | 04/19/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/19/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/12/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/21 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 04/01/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/31/2021 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/19/2021 | Public Hearing 02/23 | ||
Senate | 02/18/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |