Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00927 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 06/07/2021

                             
 
 
Substitute Senate Bill No. 927 
 
Public Act No. 21-42 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING REVISIONS TO THE SEWAGE SPILL 
RIGHT-TO-KNOW STATUTE. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. Section 22a-424a of the general statutes is repealed and the 
following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective October 1, 2021): 
(a) For the purposes of this section: 
(1) "Sewage treatment plant or collection system" means any sewage 
treatment plant, water pollution control facility, related pumping 
station, collection system or other public sewage works; 
(2) "Sewage spill" means the diversion of wastes from any portion of 
a sewage treatment plant or collection system in this state; [that 
reasonably initiates public health, safety or welfare concerns, or 
environmental concerns;] 
(3) "Combined sewer" means structures which are designed to 
convey both sanitary and storm sewage, and allow the overflow of such 
combined sewage, untreated, to the waters of the state during periods 
of high flows; and 
(4) "Electronic report" means a reporting form that uses an electronic  Substitute Senate Bill No. 927 
 
Public Act No. 21-42 	2 of 4 
 
format as prescribed by the Commissioner of Energy and 
Environmental Protection. 
(b) On and after July 1, 2013, the Commissioner of Energy and 
Environmental Protection shall post, on the department's Internet web 
site, a map of the state indicating [the] where sewage spills, anticipated 
combined sewer overflows [anticipated to occur during certain storm 
events. The web site may include the following relevant information 
about the overflows: (1) Location, anticipated duration and extent; (2) 
reasonable public health, safety or environmental concerns; and (3) 
public safety precautions that should be taken] and permitted sewage 
bypasses occur. The Internet web site shall include all information 
posted pursuant to subdivision (1) of subsection (c) of this section and 
shall be current.  
(c) (1) On and after July 1, 2014, not later than two hours after receipt 
of any report submitted pursuant to subdivision (2) of this subsection, 
the Commissioner of Energy and Environmental Protection shall post, 
on the department's Internet web site, notice of [unanticipated] any such 
reported sewage spills [and waters of the state that have chronic and 
persistent sewage contamination that represents a threat to public 
health, as determined by the Commissioner of Energy and 
Environmental Protection in consultation with the Commissioner of 
Public Health] and permitted sewage bypasses. Any notice or report 
posted pursuant to this subsection [may] shall contain the following 
relevant information as best determined [from the reported sewage spill 
incident] by the operator of the sewage treatment plant or collection 
system that filed the subject report: (A) The estimated volume or rate of 
discharge and, once known, the final volume discharged; (B) the level 
of treatment of the discharge; (C) the date and time the incident 
occurred; (D) the location of the discharge; (E) once known, the 
estimated or actual time the discharge ceased; (F) the geographic area 
impacted by the discharge; (G) once known, the steps taken to contain  Substitute Senate Bill No. 927 
 
Public Act No. 21-42 	3 of 4 
 
the discharge; (H) reasonable public health, safety or welfare concerns 
or environmental concerns; and (I) public safety precautions that should 
be taken. 
(2) On and after July 1, 2018, not later than two hours after becoming 
aware of any sewage spill or permitted sewage bypass, the operator of 
a sewage treatment plant or collection system shall submit an electronic 
report to the Department of Energy and Environmental Protection that 
includes all of the information required for any notice or report posted 
in accordance with the provisions of subdivision (1) of this subsection. 
Such report shall be updated by the operator on a daily basis for each 
additional day that the sewage spill or permitted sewage bypass 
continues after the submittal of the initial report and until such time as 
the sewage spill or permitted sewage bypass ceases. 
(3) On and after July 1, 2018, not later than two hours after becoming 
aware of any sewage spill or permitted sewage bypass that [exceeds five 
thousand gallons or that is anticipated to exceed five thousand gallons] 
reaches a water body or may come in contact with the general public, 
the operator of a sewage treatment plant or collection system shall notify 
the chief elected official, or such official's designee, and the local public 
health official of the municipality where the sewage spill or permitted 
sewage bypass occurred [. As soon as practicable after receiving any 
such notification, such municipality shall inform the public and 
downstream public officials, as appropriate.] and the chief elected 
official, or such official's designee, and the local public health official of 
any municipality that may be potentially impacted downstream by such 
spill or sewage bypass. As soon as practicable, but not later than two 
hours after receipt of any such notice pursuant to this subdivision, each 
such chief elected official, in conjunction with the local public health 
official, shall inform the public of any sewage spill or permitted sewage 
bypass that has the potential to impact public health, safety or the 
environment. Any such information provided to the public may be  Substitute Senate Bill No. 927 
 
Public Act No. 21-42 	4 of 4 
 
provided through the use of social media and shall be provided in each 
predominant language spoken by the residents of such municipality. 
(4) Not later than December 1, 2021, the Department of Energy and 
Environmental Protection shall implement a real-time public 
notification system, through which the public may choose to be notified 
of any sewage spills or permitted sewage bypasses as such sewage spills 
or permitted sewage bypasses are reported electronically to said 
department. Such real-time public notifications shall occur not later than 
two hours after said department's receipt of any such report.  
(5) Not later than February 1, 2022, and annually thereafter, the 
Department of Energy and Environmental Protection shall publish and 
make publicly available on the department's Internet web site an annual 
report that includes a summary of the sewage spills that occurred within 
each municipality during such year, a summary of sewage spills that 
reached named or identified water bodies, a summary of the total 
volume of each category of sewage spill and any enforcement actions 
taken by the department related to such sewage spills. 
[(d) The Commissioner of Energy and Environmental Protection shall 
consult with the Commissioner of Public Health, operators of sewage 
treatment plant or collection systems and state and local environmental 
and health agencies when developing the notice required by 
subdivision (1) of subsection (c) of this section.] 
[(e)] (d) Any report to the Department of Energy and Environmental 
Protection that is required pursuant to section 22a-430-3 of the 
regulations of Connecticut state agencies shall be submitted as an 
electronic report. 
[(f)] (e) The failure to file an electronic report pursuant to any provision 
of this section shall be deemed a violation of the provisions of this 
section for purposes of section 22a-438.