Senate | 07/07/2021 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 06/30/2021 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/30/2021 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 06/23/2021 | Public Act 21-124 | ||
Senate | 06/07/2021 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/07/2021 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 06/05/2021 | House Calendar Number 594 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 06/04/2021 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/20/2021 | File Number 534 | ||
Senate | 04/20/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 314 | ||
Senate | 04/20/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/20/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/13/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/21 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/05/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/31/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/12/2021 | Public Hearing 03/19 | ||
Senate | 02/24/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |