Senate | 04/28/2021 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 04/06/2021 | File Number 289 | ||
Senate | 04/06/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 191 | ||
Senate | 04/06/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/06/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/29/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/21 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/19/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/18/2021 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/26/2021 | Public Hearing 03/04 | ||
Senate | 02/24/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |