Senate | 03/30/2021 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/30/2021 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/24/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/23/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/22/2021 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/26/2021 | Public Hearing 03/04 | ||
Senate | 02/25/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |