Senate | 04/07/2021 | File Number 318 | ||
Senate | 04/07/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 214 | ||
Senate | 04/07/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/07/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/30/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/21 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/22/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/21/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/01/2021 | Public Hearing 03/05 | ||
Senate | 02/26/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |