Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00970 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 04/07/2021

                     
Researcher: JSB 	Page 1 	4/7/21 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
SB 970  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING EXTENDING THE TIME OF EXPIRATION 
OF CERTAIN LAND USE PERMITS.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill gives developers more time to complete an ongoing project 
without seeking reapproval. It does so by extending the initial and 
extended deadlines for completing projects that require certain 
subdivision, wetlands, or site plan approval. The bill applies to 
approvals that were (1) granted on or after July 1, 2011, but before the 
bill’s passage, and (2) unexpired on March 10, 2020. The bill does not 
apply to site plan approvals for large-scale housing or business 
development projects. 
When a planning or zoning commission, combined planning and 
zoning commission, or an inland wetlands agency approves a project, 
it must set an expiration date that falls within the timeframes the law 
specifies. Consequently, a developer must complete the project before 
that date or resubmit it to the local commission or agency for 
approval. Generally, under current law, the maximum timeframe, 
including extensions if permitted, is 10 years from the date of 
approval.  Under the bill, it is 11 years.  
Executive Order (EO) 7JJ, § 3, issued on May 6, 2020, and 
subsequently extended, generally tolls the expiration dates for various 
land use approvals that were valid on March 10, 2020 (including site 
plan, wetlands, and subdivision approvals), thus pausing these 
approvals so they will not expire during the declared emergencies.  It 
is unclear what impact the bill has on approvals that are tolled by the 
EO.  
EFFECTIVE DATE:  Upon passage 
PROJECT COMPLETION D EADLINES   2021SB-00970-R000321-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JSB 	Page 2 	4/7/21 
 
The bill generally extends the initial and extended expiration 
deadlines that apply to subdivision, wetlands, and relatively small-
scale site plans approvals that were (1) granted on or after July 1, 2011, 
but before the bill’s passage and (2) unexpired on March 10, 
2020.  Table 1, below, shows these changes. 
Table 1: Deadlines and Extensions Under Current Law and the Bill 
Land Use Approval 
(CGS §) 
Current Law 	Bill 
Residential site plans for projects 
with 400 or more units 
(§ 8-3(j)) 
Deadline: 10 years after approval  No change 
No extensions 
Business site plans for projects 
with at least 400,000 square feet 
(§ 8-3(j)) 
Deadline: 5-10 years after approval 
(set locally) 
No change 
Extension: up to 10 years from 
approval 
Other site plans 
(§ 8-3(i)) 
Deadline: 5 years after approval  At least 6 
years after 
approval 
Extension: up to 10 years from 
approval 
Up to 11 
years from 
approval 
Subdivisions plans for 400 or 
more dwelling units 
(§ 8-26g) 
Deadline: 10 years after approval  11 years after 
approval 
No extensions 	No change 
Other subdivisions 
(§ 8-26c(a)&(b)) 
Deadline: 5 years after approval  At least 6 
years after 
approval 
Extension: up to 10 years from 
approval 
Up to 11 
years from 
approval  2021SB-00970-R000321-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JSB 	Page 3 	4/7/21 
 
Wetlands permits associated with 
another approval (e.g., site plans 
and subdivisions) 
(§ 22a-42a(d)(2)) 
Deadline: 10 years after approval or 
the date the associated land use 
approval expires (whichever is earlier) 
At least 6 
years from 
approval  
Extension: up to 10 years from 
approval 
Up to 11 
years from 
approval 
Other wetlands 
(§ 22a-42a(d)(2)) 
Deadline: 2-5 years after approval 
(set locally) 
At least 6 
years after 
approval 
Extension: up to 10 years from 
approval 
Up to 11 
years from 
approval 
 
BACKGROUND 
Related Executive Order 
Under EO 7JJ, the expiration date of various land use approvals is 
tolled during the declared emergencies (§ 3, issued on May 6, 2020, 
and subsequently extended). The tolling provision applies only if the 
approval-holder was not in violation of the approval’s conditions on 
March 10, 2020, and does not violate them during the declared 
emergencies (a waiver of this requirement is available). 
Related Bill 
sHB 6541, favorably reported by the Planning and Development 
Committee, for permits issued on or after July 1, 2021, delays the 
effective date of municipal inland wetlands permits to coincide with 
the effective period of related local land use approvals (e.g., special 
permits, zoning variances, site plans, subdivision plans). 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Planning and Development Committee 
Joint Favorable 
Yea 26 Nay 0 (03/21/2021)