Senate | 03/22/2021 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Human Services | ||
Senate | 03/22/2021 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Human Services | ||
Senate | 03/22/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/12/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Human Services | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | Public Hearing 03/09 | ||
Senate | 03/02/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |