Senate | 04/28/2021 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/19/2021 | File Number 517 | ||
Senate | 04/19/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 311 | ||
Senate | 04/19/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/19/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/12/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/21 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 04/01/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/31/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | Public Hearing 03/11 | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |