Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00996 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 12, 2021
Fiscal Note March 29, 2021
Bill March 3, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis September 28, 2021
Bill March 29, 2021
Analysis March 29, 2021

Chaptered

Bill May 27, 2021