LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Connecticut CT
Legislatures
2021 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB01020
Draft Versions
CT
Connecticut Senate Bill SB01020
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Connecticut 2021 Regular Session
Connecticut Senate Bill SB01020
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Fiscal Note
May 21, 2021
Fiscal Note
May 20, 2021
Fiscal Note
April 28, 2021
Fiscal Note
April 26, 2021
Fiscal Note
April 17, 2021
Fiscal Note
March 30, 2021
Bill
March 3, 2021
Compare
Comm Sub
Analysis
August 5, 2021
Analysis
May 21, 2021
Analysis
March 30, 2021
Bill
March 30, 2021
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
June 15, 2021
Compare