1 | 1 | | |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | |
---|
6 | 6 | | LCO No. 4709 1 of 4 |
---|
7 | 7 | | |
---|
8 | 8 | | General Assembly Raised Bill No. 1040 |
---|
9 | 9 | | January Session, 2021 |
---|
10 | 10 | | LCO No. 4709 |
---|
11 | 11 | | |
---|
12 | 12 | | |
---|
13 | 13 | | Referred to Committee on FINANCE, REVENUE AN D |
---|
14 | 14 | | BONDING |
---|
15 | 15 | | |
---|
16 | 16 | | |
---|
17 | 17 | | Introduced by: |
---|
18 | 18 | | (FIN) |
---|
19 | 19 | | |
---|
20 | 20 | | |
---|
21 | 21 | | |
---|
22 | 22 | | |
---|
23 | 23 | | AN ACT CONCERNING TH E ADMISSIONS TAX. |
---|
24 | 24 | | Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General |
---|
25 | 25 | | Assembly convened: |
---|
26 | 26 | | |
---|
27 | 27 | | Section 1. Section 12-541 of the general statutes is repealed and the 1 |
---|
28 | 28 | | following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2021): 2 |
---|
29 | 29 | | (a) Except as provided in subsection (b) of this section, there is hereby 3 |
---|
30 | 30 | | imposed a tax of ten per cent of the admission charge to any place of 4 |
---|
31 | 31 | | amusement, entertainment or recreation. No tax shall be imposed with 5 |
---|
32 | 32 | | respect to any admission charge: 6 |
---|
33 | 33 | | (1) When the admission charge is less than one dollar or, in the case 7 |
---|
34 | 34 | | of any motion picture show, when the admission charge is not more 8 |
---|
35 | 35 | | than five dollars; 9 |
---|
36 | 36 | | (2) When a daily admission charge is imposed that entitles the patron 10 |
---|
37 | 37 | | to participate in an athletic or sporting activity; 11 |
---|
38 | 38 | | (3) To any event, other than events held at the stadium facility, as 12 |
---|
39 | 39 | | defined in section 32-651, if all of the proceeds from the event inure 13 Raised Bill No. 1040 |
---|
40 | 40 | | |
---|
41 | 41 | | |
---|
42 | 42 | | |
---|
43 | 43 | | LCO No. 4709 2 of 4 |
---|
44 | 44 | | |
---|
45 | 45 | | exclusively to an entity that is exempt from federal income tax under the 14 |
---|
46 | 46 | | Internal Revenue Code, provided such entity actively engages in and 15 |
---|
47 | 47 | | assumes the financial risk associated with the presentation of such 16 |
---|
48 | 48 | | event; 17 |
---|
49 | 49 | | (4) To any event, other than events held at the stadium facility, as 18 |
---|
50 | 50 | | defined in section 32-651, that, in the opinion of the commissioner, is 19 |
---|
51 | 51 | | conducted primarily to raise funds for an entity that is exempt from 20 |
---|
52 | 52 | | federal income tax under the Internal Revenue Code, provided the 21 |
---|
53 | 53 | | commissioner is satisfied that the net profit that inures to such entity 22 |
---|
54 | 54 | | from such event will exceed the amount of the admissions tax that, but 23 |
---|
55 | 55 | | for this subdivision, would be imposed upon the person making such 24 |
---|
56 | 56 | | charge to such event; 25 |
---|
57 | 57 | | (5) Other than for events held at the stadium facility, as defined in 26 |
---|
58 | 58 | | section 32-651, paid by centers of service for elderly persons, as 27 |
---|
59 | 59 | | described in section 17a-310; 28 |
---|
60 | 60 | | (6) To any production featuring live performances by actors or 29 |
---|
61 | 61 | | musicians presented at Gateway's Candlewood Playhouse, Ocean Beach 30 |
---|
62 | 62 | | Park or any nonprofit theater or playhouse in the state, provided such 31 |
---|
63 | 63 | | theater or playhouse possesses evidence confirming exemption from 32 |
---|
64 | 64 | | federal tax under Section 501 of the Internal Revenue Code; 33 |
---|
65 | 65 | | (7) To any carnival or amusement ride; 34 |
---|
66 | 66 | | (8) To any interscholastic athletic event held at the stadium facility, 35 |
---|
67 | 67 | | as defined in section 32-651; 36 |
---|
68 | 68 | | (9) If the admission charge would have been subject to tax under the 37 |
---|
69 | 69 | | provisions of section 12-542 of the general statutes, revision of 1958, 38 |
---|
70 | 70 | | revised to January 1, 1999; or 39 |
---|
71 | 71 | | (10) On and after July 1, 2020, to any event at the Dunkin' Donuts Park 40 |
---|
72 | 72 | | in Hartford. 41 |
---|
73 | 73 | | (b) (1) (A) For the following venues and events, for sales occurring on 42 |
---|
74 | 74 | | or after July 1, 2019, but prior to July 1, 2020, the tax imposed under this 43 Raised Bill No. 1040 |
---|
75 | 75 | | |
---|
76 | 76 | | |
---|
77 | 77 | | |
---|
78 | 78 | | LCO No. 4709 3 of 4 |
---|
79 | 79 | | |
---|
80 | 80 | | section shall be seven and one-half per cent of the admission charge to: 44 |
---|
81 | 81 | | [(A)] (i) Any event at the XL Center in Hartford; 45 |
---|
82 | 82 | | [(B)] (ii) Any event at Dillon Stadium in Hartford; 46 |
---|
83 | 83 | | [(C)] (iii) Any athletic event presented by a member team of the 47 |
---|
84 | 84 | | Atlantic League of Professional Baseball at the New Britain Stadium; 48 |
---|
85 | 85 | | [(D)] (iv) Any event at the Webster Bank Arena in Bridgeport; 49 |
---|
86 | 86 | | [(E)] (v) Any event at the Harbor Yard Amphitheater in Bridgeport; 50 |
---|
87 | 87 | | [(F)] (vi) Any event at Dodd Stadium in Norwich; 51 |
---|
88 | 88 | | [(G)] (vii) Any event at the Oakdale Theatre in Wallingford; and 52 |
---|
89 | 89 | | [(H)] (viii) Any event other than an interscholastic athletic event at 53 |
---|
90 | 90 | | the stadium facility, as defined in section 32-651. 54 |
---|
91 | 91 | | [(2)] (B) For sales occurring on or after July 1, 2019, but prior to July 55 |
---|
92 | 92 | | 1, 2020, for any event at the Dunkin' Donuts Park in Hartford, the tax 56 |
---|
93 | 93 | | imposed under this section shall be five per cent of the admission 57 |
---|
94 | 94 | | charge. 58 |
---|
95 | 95 | | [(3)] (C) For the venues and events specified in subparagraph (A) of 59 |
---|
96 | 96 | | this subdivision, [(1) of this subsection,] for sales occurring on or after 60 |
---|
97 | 97 | | July 1, 2020, but prior to July 1, 2021, the tax imposed under this section 61 |
---|
98 | 98 | | shall be five per cent of the admission charge. 62 |
---|
99 | 99 | | (2) For the following venues and events, for sales occurring on or after 63 |
---|
100 | 100 | | July 1, 2021, the tax imposed under this section shall be five per cent of 64 |
---|
101 | 101 | | the admission charge to: 65 |
---|
102 | 102 | | (A) Any event at the XL Center in Hartford; 66 |
---|
103 | 103 | | (B) Any event at Dillon Stadium in Hartford; 67 |
---|
104 | 104 | | (C) Any event at New Britain Stadium; 68 Raised Bill No. 1040 |
---|
105 | 105 | | |
---|
106 | 106 | | |
---|
107 | 107 | | |
---|
108 | 108 | | LCO No. 4709 4 of 4 |
---|
109 | 109 | | |
---|
110 | 110 | | (D) Any event at Webster Bank Arena in Bridgeport; 69 |
---|
111 | 111 | | (E) Any event at Harbor Yard Amphitheater in Bridgeport; 70 |
---|
112 | 112 | | (F) Any event at Dodd Stadium in Norwich; 71 |
---|
113 | 113 | | (G) Any event at the Oakdale Theatre in Wallingford; 72 |
---|
114 | 114 | | (H) Any event at the Xfinity Theatre in Hartford; and 73 |
---|
115 | 115 | | (I) Any event other than an interscholastic athletic event at the 74 |
---|
116 | 116 | | stadium facility, as defined in section 32-651. 75 |
---|
117 | 117 | | [(4)] (3) On and after July 1, 2001, the tax imposed under this section 76 |
---|
118 | 118 | | on any motion picture show shall be six per cent of the admission 77 |
---|
119 | 119 | | charge. 78 |
---|
120 | 120 | | (c) The tax shall be imposed upon the person making such charge and 79 |
---|
121 | 121 | | reimbursement for the tax shall be collected by such person from the 80 |
---|
122 | 122 | | purchase. Such reimbursement, termed "tax", shall be paid by the 81 |
---|
123 | 123 | | purchaser to the person making the admission charge. Such tax, when 82 |
---|
124 | 124 | | added to the admission charge, shall be a debt from the purchaser to the 83 |
---|
125 | 125 | | person making the admission charge and shall be recoverable at law. 84 |
---|
126 | 126 | | The amount of tax reimbursement, when so collected, shall be deemed 85 |
---|
127 | 127 | | to be a special fund in trust for the state of Connecticut. 86 |
---|
128 | 128 | | This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following |
---|
129 | 129 | | sections: |
---|
130 | 130 | | |
---|
131 | 131 | | Section 1 July 1, 2021 12-541 |
---|
132 | 132 | | |
---|
133 | 133 | | Statement of Purpose: |
---|
134 | 134 | | To allow any event at New Britain Stadium and the Xfinity Theatre in |
---|
135 | 135 | | Hartford to be subject to the five per cent admissions tax rate. |
---|
136 | 136 | | [Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except |
---|
137 | 137 | | that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not |
---|
138 | 138 | | underlined.] |
---|
139 | 139 | | |
---|