Senate | 04/29/2021 | House Calendar Number 435 | ||
Senate | 04/29/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/28/2021 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/28/2021 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 04/28/2021 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7674 | ||
Senate | 04/07/2021 | File Number 326 | ||
Senate | 04/07/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 210 | ||
Senate | 04/07/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/07/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/31/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/21 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/23/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/22/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/12/2021 | Public Hearing 03/18 | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |