Senate | 05/14/2021 | House Calendar Number 513 | ||
Senate | 05/14/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/12/2021 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 05/12/2021 | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 8312 | ||
Senate | 04/26/2021 | File Number 615 | ||
Senate | 04/26/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 350 | ||
Senate | 04/26/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/26/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/19/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/26/21 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 04/08/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/05/2021 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/18/2021 | Public Hearing 03/22 | ||
Senate | 03/17/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |