Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01073 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 7, 2021
Fiscal Note April 19, 2021
Bill March 17, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis June 8, 2021
Bill June 1, 2021
Bill April 19, 2021
Analysis April 19, 2021