House
|
07/13/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2021
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2021
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2021
|
Public Act 21-198
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2021
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2021
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2021
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2021
|
House Calendar Number 607
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2021
|
Transmitted Pursuant to the Joint Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 10338
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
File Number 494
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Senate Calendar Number 287
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2021
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/21 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2021
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2021
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2021
|
Public Hearing 03/26
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2021
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|