Senate | 06/09/2021 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/20/2021 | File Number 537 | ||
Senate | 04/20/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 318 | ||
Senate | 04/20/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/20/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/13/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/21 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/05/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/31/2021 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/25/2021 | Public Hearing 03/29 | ||
Senate | 03/23/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |