Senate | 06/14/2021 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 06/08/2021 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/08/2021 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 06/07/2021 | Public Act 21-40 | ||
Senate | 06/02/2021 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/02/2021 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 04/29/2021 | House Calendar Number 450 | ||
Senate | 04/29/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/28/2021 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/22/2021 | File Number 592 | ||
Senate | 04/22/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 342 | ||
Senate | 04/22/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/22/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/16/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/21/21 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/06/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/05/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/26/2021 | Public Hearing 03/31 | ||
Senate | 03/25/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |