LCO \\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2021SB-01094-R01- SB.docx 1 of 3 General Assembly Substitute Bill No. 1094 January Session, 2021 AN ACT AUTHORIZING B ONDS OF THE STATE FO R CTNEXT AND THE INNOVATION PLACE PROGRAM. Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened: Section 1. (Effective July 1, 2022) (a) For the purposes described in 1 subsection (b) of this section, the State Bond Commission shall have the 2 power from time to time to authorize the issuance of bonds of the state 3 in one or more series and in principal amounts not exceeding in the 4 aggregate sixty-four million dollars, provided (1) thirteen million five 5 hundred thousand dollars of such authorization shall be effective July 6 1, 2022, (2) twenty-three million five hundred thousand dollars of such 7 authorization shall be effective July 1, 2023, (3) thirteen million five 8 hundred thousand dollars of such authorization shall be effective July 9 1, 2024, and (4) thirteen million five hundred thousand dollars of such 10 authorization shall be effective July 1, 2025. 11 (b) The proceeds of the sale of such bonds, to the extent of the amount 12 stated in subsection (a) of this section, shall be used by CTNext for the 13 purpose of recapitalizing the innovation place program established 14 under section 32-39k of the general statutes for existing and new 15 innovation places, provided ten million dollars shall be deposited in the 16 fiscal year commencing July 1, 2023, in the CTNext Fund established 17 under section 32-39i of the general statutes for general operational 18 purposes. 19 Substitute Bill No. 1094 LCO {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2021SB-01094- R01-SB.docx } 2 of 3 (c) All provisions of section 3-20 of the general statutes, or the exercise 20 of any right or power granted thereby, that are not inconsistent with the 21 provisions of this section are hereby adopted and shall apply to all 22 bonds authorized by the State Bond Commission pursuant to this 23 section. Temporary notes in anticipation of the money to be derived 24 from the sale of any such bonds so authorized may be issued in 25 accordance with section 3-20 of the general statutes and from time to 26 time renewed. Such bonds shall mature at such time or times not 27 exceeding twenty years from their respective dates as may be provided 28 in or pursuant to the resolution or resolutions of the State Bond 29 Commission authorizing such bonds. None of such bonds shall be 30 authorized except upon a finding by the State Bond Commission that 31 there has been filed with it a request for such authorization that is signed 32 by or on behalf of the Secretary of the Office of Policy and Management 33 and states such terms and conditions as said commission, in its 34 discretion, may require. Such bonds issued pursuant to this section shall 35 be general obligations of the state and the full faith and credit of the state 36 of Connecticut are pledged for the payment of the principal of and 37 interest on such bonds as the same become due, and accordingly and as 38 part of the contract of the state with the holders of such bonds, 39 appropriation of all amounts necessary for punctual payment of such 40 principal and interest is hereby made, and the State Treasurer shall pay 41 such principal and interest as the same become due. 42 Sec. 2. Subsection (a) of section 32-39l of the general statutes is 43 repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 44 2022): 45 (a) [On or before July 1, 2016,] Connecticut Innovations, Incorporated 46 shall post on its Internet web site an application form, prescribed by 47 Connecticut Innovations, Incorporated, for planning grants-in-aid 48 awarded pursuant to subsection (b) of this section. Such application 49 form shall state that applications for planning grants-in-aid shall be 50 submitted to the CTNext board. 51 Sec. 3. Subparagraph (E) of subdivision (2) of subsection (a) of section 52 Substitute Bill No. 1094 LCO {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2021SB-01094- R01-SB.docx } 3 of 3 32-39m of the general statutes is repealed and the following is 53 substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2021): 54 (E) The CTNext board shall report, in accordance with the provisions 55 of section 11-4a, to the joint standing committees of the General 56 Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to commerce and 57 finance, revenue and bonding on or before September [30, 2017, and on 58 or before July first annually thereafter until September 30, 2020] thirtieth 59 annually, regarding the grants-in-aid distributed pursuant to this 60 section and concerning the operation and effectiveness of the innovation 61 place program. 62 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections: Section 1 July 1, 2022 New section Sec. 2 July 1, 2022 32-39l(a) Sec. 3 July 1, 2021 32-39m(a)(2)(E) Statement of Legislative Commissioners: In Section 1(a), "thousand" was added after "hundred" for accuracy. FIN Joint Favorable Subst. -LCO