House
|
07/13/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
07/02/2021
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
07/02/2021
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2021
|
Public Act 21-201
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2021
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2021
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2021
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2021
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2021
|
Disagreeing Action, Tabled for Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2021
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 10175
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2021
|
House Calendar Number 600
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2021
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 10105
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2021
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 10107
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
File Number 671
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
Senate Calendar Number 403
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2021
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/10/21 10:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Public Hearing 04/20
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|