Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01100 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 06/05/2021

                     
Researcher: RP 	Page 1 	6/5/21 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
SB 1100 (File 671, as amended by Senate "A" and "B")*  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING THE FAILURE TO FILE FOR CERTAIN 
GRAND LIST EXEMPTIONS.  
 
SUMMARY 
The FY 20-21 budget act increased, from $20 to $80, the fee that 
specified business entities must pay to file an annual report with the 
secretary of the state (PA 19-117, §§ 344-346). Under current law, the 
fee increase applies for annual reports filed beginning July 1, 2020. This 
bill instead provides that for limited liability companies, the $80 filing 
fee applies to annual reports filed for any year on or after July 1, 2020, 
rather than any filings made on or after that date. Reports filed for any 
year before July 1, 2020, are subject to the $20 fee. By law, unchanged 
by the bill, the annual report filing fee for limited partnerships and 
limited liability partnerships remains at $80 for reports filed on or after 
July 1, 2020. 
The bill also allows taxpayers in three municipalities to claim a 
property tax exemption for specified property and grand lists even 
though they missed the November 1 filing deadline. 
*Senate Amendment “A” (1) eliminates failure to file provisions 
concerning specified renewable energy systems in Middlefield and 
Middletown for the 2020 grand list year and (2) adds an additional 
failure to file provision for Middletown for the 2017-2019 grand list 
years.  
*Senate Amendment “B” adds the annual report filing fee provision. 
EFFECTIVE DATE:  July 1, 2021, for the property tax exemption 
provisions and upon passage for the annual report filing fee provision. 
EXEMPTION DEADLINE W AIVERS 
The bill allows taxpayers in Hartford, Plainville, and Middletown to  2021SB-01100-R01-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: RP 	Page 2 	6/5/21 
 
claim a property tax exemption, for the property and grand lists shown 
in Table 1, even though they missed the November 1 filing deadline. It 
does so by waiving the deadline if the taxpayer files for the exemption 
by July 31, 2021, and pays the statutory late filing fee. The tax assessor 
must confirm that he or she received the fee, verify the property’s 
eligibility for the exemption, and subsequently approve the exemption. 
The municipality must refund any taxes, interest, or penalties paid on 
the property as if the claim was timely filed. 
Table 1: Exemption Deadline Waivers Under the Bill 
Municipality Grand 
List 
Exemption 
Hartford 2018 and 
2019 
Machinery and equipment used for manufacturing, 
biotechnology, and recycling (§ 12-81(76)) 
Plainville 2020 
Middletown 2017 Property owned, or held in trust for, any corporation organized 
exclusively for scientific, educational, literary, historical, or 
charitable purposes and used exclusively for such purposes or 
preserving open space land (§ 12-81(7)) 
2017, 
2018, and 
2019 
 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee 
Joint Favorable 
Yea 47 Nay 1 (04/22/2021)