Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01102 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11
22
33
44
55 LCO No. 6675 1 of 4
66
77 General Assembly Raised Bill No. 1102
88 January Session, 2021
99 LCO No. 6675
1010
1111
1212 Referred to Committee on FINANCE, REVENUE AND
1313 BONDING
1414
1515
1616 Introduced by:
1717 (FIN)
1818
1919
2020
2121
2222 AN ACT CONCERNING A LOAN PROGRAM TO ASSI ST TAXPAYERS
2323 WITH THE PAYMENT OF CERTAIN REAL PROPERTY TAXES.
2424 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General
2525 Assembly convened:
2626
2727 Section 1. (Effective July 1, 2021) (a) There is established a property tax 1
2828 payment loan program under which eligible taxpayers may receive 2
2929 loans for the payment of certain real property taxes that are delinquent 3
3030 or of real property taxes due for the 2021 grand list, or both. The 4
3131 Secretary of the Office of Policy and Management shall use the proceeds 5
3232 of the sale of the bonds under section 2 of this act to provide such loans 6
3333 in accordance with the provisions of this section. Any loan provided 7
3434 under the program shall be amortized over a five-year period 8
3535 commencing January 1, 2023. The secretary shall provide each 9
3636 municipality with an amortization schedule for such loans, to be 10
3737 distributed to taxpayers participating in the program. 11
3838 (b) (1) To be eligible to receive a loan under the program, a taxpayer 12
3939 shall have been current on all property taxes prior to January 1, 2020. 13
4040 Each eligible taxpayer wishing to participate in the loan program shall 14 Raised Bill No. 1102
4141
4242
4343
4444 LCO No. 6675 2 of 4
4545
4646 register, not later than July 31, 2021, with the municipality to which such 15
4747 taxpayer owes or will owe real property taxes for any tax period on or 16
4848 after July 1, 2020, through June 30, 2022. Such taxpayer may request a 17
4949 loan in the amount of the delinquent real property taxes and interest 18
5050 owing or the amount of real property taxes due for the 2021 grand list, 19
5151 or both, as applicable, provided no additional interest shall accrue on or 20
5252 after August 1, 2021, on delinquent real property taxes for which an 21
5353 eligible taxpayer has requested a loan pursuant to this section. 22
5454 (2) Any amount paid by the Office of Policy and Management to a 23
5555 municipality pursuant to subsection (c) of this section on behalf of a 24
5656 taxpayer shall constitute a loan made to the taxpayer and each such 25
5757 taxpayer shall execute, in such form and manner as prescribed by the 26
5858 Secretary of the Office of Policy and Management, a loan repayment 27
5959 agreement upon approval of the distribution of funds by the secretary 28
6060 under subsection (c) of this section. The amount paid to a municipality 29
6161 on behalf of a taxpayer under the program shall constitute a property 30
6262 tax lien upon the real property against which the real property tax is 31
6363 assessed. 32
6464 (3) Each taxpayer that receives a loan under the program shall remit 33
6565 each payment required under the repayment agreement to the tax 34
6666 collector of the municipality to which the real property tax is owed. Each 35
6767 tax collector shall remit any such payments received to the 36
6868 Commissioner of Revenue Services, in a form and manner prescribed by 37
6969 the commissioner. 38
7070 (c) (1) Each municipality with which a taxpayer has registered for the 39
7171 loan program shall apply to the Office of Policy and Management, in 40
7272 such form and manner as the Secretary of the Office of Policy and 41
7373 Management prescribes, for the amount of property taxes and interest 42
7474 due such municipality from taxpayers that have registered for the loan 43
7575 program, and including such information regarding the amounts 44
7676 requested and each requesting taxpayer as the secretary may require. 45
7777 The secretary shall promptly review the applications received and 46
7878 distribute the amount of funds sought to municipalities. 47 Raised Bill No. 1102
7979
8080
8181
8282 LCO No. 6675 3 of 4
8383
8484 (2) Each municipality shall publicize the availability of and eligibility 48
8585 requirements for the loan program to its taxpayers and provide 49
8686 instructions on how an eligible taxpayer may register with the 50
8787 municipality to receive a loan under the program. 51
8888 Sec. 2. (Effective July 1, 2021) (a) For the purposes described in 52
8989 subsection (b) of this section, the State Bond Commission shall have the 53
9090 power from time to time to authorize the issuance of bonds of the state 54
9191 in one or more series and in principal amounts not exceeding in the 55
9292 aggregate three billion dollars. 56
9393 (b) The proceeds of the sale of such bonds, to the extent of the amount 57
9494 stated in subsection (a) of this section, shall be used by the Office of 58
9595 Policy and Management for the purpose of providing loans for the 59
9696 payment of certain delinquent real property taxes and certain real 60
9797 property taxes for the 2021 grand list, in accordance with the provisions 61
9898 of section 1 of this act. 62
9999 (c) All provisions of section 3-20 of the general statutes, or the exercise 63
100100 of any right or power granted thereby, that are not inconsistent with the 64
101101 provisions of this section are hereby adopted and shall apply to all 65
102102 bonds authorized by the State Bond Commission pursuant to this 66
103103 section. Temporary notes in anticipation of the money to be derived 67
104104 from the sale of any such bonds so authorized may be issued in 68
105105 accordance with section 3-20 of the general statutes and from time to 69
106106 time renewed. Such bonds shall mature at such time or times not 70
107107 exceeding five years from their respective dates as may be provided in 71
108108 or pursuant to the resolution or resolutions of the State Bond 72
109109 Commission authorizing such bonds. None of such bonds shall be 73
110110 authorized except upon a finding by the State Bond Commission that 74
111111 there has been filed with it a request for such authorization that is signed 75
112112 by or on behalf of the Secretary of the Office of Policy and Management 76
113113 and states such terms and conditions as said commission, in its 77
114114 discretion, may require. Such bonds issued pursuant to this section shall 78
115115 be general obligations of the state and the full faith and credit of the state 79
116116 of Connecticut are pledged for the payment of the principal of and 80 Raised Bill No. 1102
117117
118118
119119
120120 LCO No. 6675 4 of 4
121121
122122 interest on such bonds as the same become due, and accordingly and as 81
123123 part of the contract of the state with the holders of such bonds, 82
124124 appropriation of all amounts necessary for punctual payment of such 83
125125 principal and interest is hereby made, and the State Treasurer shall pay 84
126126 such principal and interest as the same become due. 85
127127 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following
128128 sections:
129129
130130 Section 1 July 1, 2021 New section
131131 Sec. 2 July 1, 2021 New section
132132
133133 Statement of Purpose:
134134 To establish a loan program to assist taxpayers with the payment of
135135 certain real property taxes.
136136 [Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except
137137 that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not
138138 underlined.]
139139