Senate | 05/10/2021 | File Number 672 | ||
Senate | 05/10/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 404 | ||
Senate | 05/10/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/10/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/03/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/10/21 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 04/22/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/22/2021 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 04/15/2021 | Public Hearing 04/20 | ||
Senate | 04/14/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |