Senate
|
07/02/2021
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2021
|
Public Act 21-2
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2021
|
Signed by Governor in Original
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2021
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2021
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2021
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,G,H
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2021
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A,G,H
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2021
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2021
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2021
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,G,H
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2021
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2021
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule H 11013
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2021
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule G 11007
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2021
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule F 10974
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2021
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule E 11011
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2021
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule D 11006
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2021
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule C 10921
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2021
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 10996
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2021
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 11000
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2021
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2021
|
Immediate Transmittal to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2021
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 10933
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2021
|
Emergency Certification
|
|
|