Senate | 04/26/2021 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 04/26/2021 | Adopted, House | ||
Senate | 03/22/2021 | House Calendar Number 106 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 03/01/2021 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 03/01/2021 | Adopted, Senate | ||
Senate | 02/11/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 17 | ||
Senate | 02/11/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 02/09/2021 | Public Hearing 02/09 | ||
Senate | 01/06/2021 | Nomination Referred to Committee on Executive and Legislative Nominations |