Senate | 04/26/2021 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 04/26/2021 | Adopted, House | ||
Senate | 04/15/2021 | House Calendar Number 351 | ||
Senate | 04/15/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/14/2021 | Adopted, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/29/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 159 | ||
Senate | 03/29/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/18/2021 | Public Hearing 03/25 | ||
Senate | 01/06/2021 | Nomination Referred to Committee on Executive and Legislative Nominations |