Senate | 05/06/2021 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/06/2021 | Adopted, House | ||
Senate | 04/29/2021 | House Calendar Number 451 | ||
Senate | 04/29/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/28/2021 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/28/2021 | Adopted, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/28/2021 | Rules Suspended | ||
Senate | 04/28/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 374 | ||
Senate | 04/28/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/20/2021 | Public Hearing 04/20 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2021 | Nomination Referred to Committee on Executive and Legislative Nominations |