Senate | 05/27/2021 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/27/2021 | Adopted, House | ||
Senate | 05/21/2021 | House Calendar Number 519 | ||
Senate | 05/21/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/20/2021 | Adopted, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/10/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 407 | ||
Senate | 05/10/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/07/2021 | Public Hearing 05/07 | ||
Senate | 04/13/2021 | Nomination Referred to Committee on Executive and Legislative Nominations |