Senate | 04/28/2021 | Adopted, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/20/2021 | File Number 538 | ||
Senate | 04/20/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 319 | ||
Senate | 04/20/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/20/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/19/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/26/21 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 04/15/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/15/2021 | Senate Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/07/2021 | Public Hearing 04/15 | ||
Senate | 04/01/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/30/2021 | Filed with Senate Clerks |