Senate | 06/04/2021 | Adopted, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/25/2021 | File Number 720 | ||
Senate | 05/25/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 480 | ||
Senate | 05/25/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/25/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/19/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/24/21 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 05/18/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/17/2021 | Senate Favorable | ||
Senate | 05/11/2021 | Public Hearing 05/17 | ||
Senate | 05/10/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 05/06/2021 | Filed with Senate Clerks |