House | 04/25/2022 | File Number 594 | ||
House | 04/25/2022 | House Calendar Number 457 | ||
House | 04/25/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/25/2022 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/18/2022 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/25/22 12:00 PM | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/17/2022 | Public Hearing 02/24 | ||
House | 02/17/2022 | Public Hearing 02/23 | ||
House | 02/17/2022 | Public Hearing 02/22 | ||
House | 02/14/2022 | Public Hearing 02/18 | ||
House | 02/14/2022 | Public Hearing 02/17 | ||
House | 02/14/2022 | Public Hearing 02/16 | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations |