House | 04/29/2022 | File Number 677 | ||
House | 04/29/2022 | Senate Calendar Number 516 | ||
House | 04/29/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/27/2022 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 04/27/2022 | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 5690 | ||
House | 04/27/2022 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5600 | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | File Number 56 | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | House Calendar Number 85 | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/22 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/24/2022 | Public Hearing 03/01 | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |