Connecticut 2022 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05044 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 27, 2022
Fiscal Note April 26, 2022
Fiscal Note March 28, 2022
Bill February 9, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis June 9, 2022
Analysis April 27, 2022
Bill April 18, 2022
Bill March 28, 2022
Analysis March 28, 2022

Chaptered

Bill May 10, 2022