Senate | 04/29/2022 | Senate Recommitted to Environment | ||
Senate | 04/27/2022 | Senate Calendar Number 511 | ||
Senate | 04/27/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/27/2022 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | ||
House | 04/26/2022 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/20/2022 | Bill Passed Temporarily | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | File Number 228 | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | House Calendar Number 191 | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/25/2022 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/22 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/18/2022 | Public Hearing 02/25 | ||
House | 02/17/2022 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |