Connecticut 2022 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05146 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 21, 2022
Fiscal Note April 20, 2022
Fiscal Note April 13, 2022
Fiscal Note March 30, 2022
Bill February 16, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis June 16, 2022
Analysis April 21, 2022
Analysis April 20, 2022
Bill March 30, 2022
Analysis March 30, 2022

Chaptered

Bill May 4, 2022