House | 04/06/2022 | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | File Number 125 | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | House Calendar Number 134 | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/22 12:00 PM | ||
House | 03/11/2022 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/18/2022 | Public Hearing 02/22 | ||
House | 02/17/2022 | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |