House | 05/24/2022 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 05/17/2022 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 05/17/2022 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 05/13/2022 | Public Act 22-71 | ||
House | 05/04/2022 | In Concurrence | ||
House | 05/04/2022 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Senate Calendar Number 63 | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 03/16/2022 | House Passed | ||
House | 03/16/2022 | Rules Suspended | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | File Number 7 | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | House Calendar Number 41 | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/15/22 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/04/2022 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/18/2022 | Public Hearing 02/25 | ||
House | 02/17/2022 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |