House | 04/13/2022 | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 03/16/2022 | File Number 27 | ||
House | 03/16/2022 | House Calendar Number 54 | ||
House | 03/16/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/16/2022 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/15/22 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/04/2022 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/18/2022 | Public Hearing 02/22 | ||
House | 02/17/2022 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |