House | 04/06/2022 | File Number 325 | ||
House | 04/06/2022 | House Calendar Number 237 | ||
House | 04/06/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/06/2022 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/22 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/25/2022 | Public Hearing 03/03 | ||
House | 02/23/2022 | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |