House | 04/20/2022 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/20/2022 | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 04/20/2022 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/20/2022 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/20/2022 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/13/2022 | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | File Number 63 | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | House Calendar Number 92 | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/16/2022 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/22 5:00 PM | ||
House | 02/25/2022 | Public Hearing 03/01 | ||
House | 02/24/2022 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |