House | 04/29/2022 | Senate Recommitted to Human Services | ||
House | 04/21/2022 | Senate Calendar Number 418 | ||
House | 04/21/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/19/2022 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/12/2022 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/12/2022 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 04/12/2022 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/12/2022 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/06/2022 | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | File Number 81 | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | House Calendar Number 94 | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/16/2022 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/22 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/25/2022 | Public Hearing 03/01 | ||
House | 02/24/2022 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |