Connecticut 2022 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05253 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 13, 2022
Fiscal Note April 19, 2022
Fiscal Note March 22, 2022
Bill February 23, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis July 29, 2022
Analysis May 4, 2022
Bill April 13, 2022
Bill March 22, 2022
Analysis March 22, 2022

Chaptered

Bill May 16, 2022