House | 04/04/2022 | File Number 278 | ||
House | 04/04/2022 | House Calendar Number 209 | ||
House | 04/04/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/04/2022 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/22 12:00 PM | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/04/2022 | Public Hearing 03/08 | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |