House
|
05/24/2022
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2022
|
Public Act 22-104
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2022
|
File Number 686
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2022
|
Senate Calendar Number 513
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2022
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5603
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
File Number 193
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
House Calendar Number 184
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/22 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2022
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Public Hearing 03/08
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
|
|
|