House | 03/29/2022 | File Number 168 | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | House Calendar Number 159 | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/22 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/04/2022 | Public Hearing 03/10 | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |