House | 04/22/2022 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/22/2022 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 04/22/2022 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/22/2022 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/22/2022 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/20/2022 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 04/13/2022 | File Number 458 | ||
House | 04/13/2022 | House Calendar Number 338 | ||
House | 04/13/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/22 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/24/2022 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/04/2022 | Public Hearing 03/08 | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |