House | 04/21/2022 | File Number 570 | ||
House | 04/21/2022 | House Calendar Number 412 | ||
House | 04/21/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/21/2022 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/14/2022 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/20/22 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations | ||
House | 03/04/2022 | Public Hearing 03/08 | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |