House
|
04/21/2022
|
File Number 580
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
Senate Calendar Number 419
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4852
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2022
|
Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
File Number 374
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
House Calendar Number 264
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2022
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/22 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Public Hearing 03/15
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
|
|
|