Senate | 05/04/2022 | Matter Pass Retained | ||
Senate | 05/04/2022 | Designated Only Senate Amendment Schedule A 6529 | ||
Senate | 05/04/2022 | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 05/04/2022 | Rules Suspended | ||
Senate | 05/04/2022 | Senate Calendar Number 565 | ||
Senate | 05/04/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/03/2022 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | ||
House | 05/03/2022 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/03/2022 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6461 | ||
House | 04/05/2022 | File Number 302 | ||
House | 04/05/2022 | House Calendar Number 232 | ||
House | 04/05/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/05/2022 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/22 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Public Hearing 03/15 | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |